Case Information: 55133 | |||
Short Caption: | BUCKWALTER VS. DIST. CT. (BAILE) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A588778 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Gibbons | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/28/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from John H. Cotton & Associates, Ltd.--check no. 6082. | ||
12/28/2009 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Writ of Prohibition; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Supporting Exhibits. | 09-31275 | |
01/08/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Answer. Due: 30 days. | 10-00672 | |
02/08/2010 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. | 10-03585 | |
06/23/2010 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Gibbons. | ||
06/24/2010 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Petition Denied." Before Hardesty/Douglas/Pickering. Author: Pickering, Kristina. Majority: Pickering/Hardesty/Douglas. 126 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 21. SNP10-Hardesty/Douglas/Pickering. | 10-16457 | |
07/20/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 10-18595 | |
07/20/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |