Case Information: 55132 | |||
Short Caption: | MATTOS VS. DIST. CT. (STATE) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR091275 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/24/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
12/24/2009 | Petition/Writ | Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ. | 09-31246 | |
12/24/2009 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Request for Immediate Stay. | 09-31253 | |
01/08/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-00610 | |
01/13/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Filing Fee on Rehearing. Due date: 10 days. | 10-01034 | |
01/14/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Corrected. No Rehearing Fee due. | 10-01266 | |
03/10/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 10-06223 | |
05/17/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC fn1[We have considered all documents in this matter, and we conclude that no relief is warranted.] | 10-12771 | |
06/11/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 10-13035 | |
06/11/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |