judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GOODMAN VS. GOODMAN (CHILD CUSTODY)

Case Information: 55123
Short Caption:GOODMAN VS. GOODMAN (CHILD CUSTODY)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D358035Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Fast Track Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/31/2009 / Schofield, PaulSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/22/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 09-31035
12/22/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court.
12/24/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Ciciliano & Associates - check no. 4366.
12/24/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Family Court Cover Sheet. (Confidential). 09-31261
12/29/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 09-31450
12/31/2009Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Paul H. Schofield 09-31614
01/19/2010TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Shelly Ajoub stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/12/09. 10-01449
01/25/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 2/23/10 10-01974
02/01/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service- Transcript of the November 12, 2009 hearing in the District Court. 10-02667
02/26/2010Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Notice to Appear for Continued Mandatory Settlement Conference. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 8, 2010. 10-05195
03/11/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: To 4/8/10 to allow counsel to prepare and submit to district court a Huneycutt motion and joinder. If court indicates inclination to grant motion to hear issues of change of custody and relocation, parties will stipulate to dismiss appeal. 10-06474
03/19/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 3/24/10 10-07375
03/29/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 10-08115
03/30/2010Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 10 days to request transcripts; 40 days to file and serve fast track statement and appendix. Respondent: 20 days from service of fast track statement to file response. NRAP3E. 10-08282
04/05/2010Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 10-08749
05/04/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent may file any reply within ten days from the date that appellant's response is served. Briefing is suspended. 10-11457
06/03/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Ex Parte Motion to Expand Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause 10-14260
06/10/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for extension of time to file response to order to show cause. Appellant: response due 6/21/10. 10-14928
06/23/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Second Ex Parte Motion to Expand Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause. (10) days. 10-16451
07/19/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Third Ex Parte Motion to Expand Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause. 10-18317
07/23/2010MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Received via E-Flex. Appellant's Response . (FILED PER ORDER 09/14/10).
08/03/2010MotionFiled Motion. Counsel for Appellant F. Peter James. 10-19985
09/14/2010Order/DispositionalOrder Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn1[Appellant's June 23 and July 19, 2010, motions for extension of time are granted, and we direct the clerk of this court to file the response received on July 23, 2010.] fn2[The August 3, 2010, motion to withdraw as appellant's counsel filed by F. Peter James of the Rocheleau Law Group is granted.] 10-23563
09/14/2010MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 10-23564
10/11/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-26479
10/11/2010Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/03/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 20, 2010. 10-26479