Case: 03-23-00410-CV
03-23-00410-CV
07/10/2023
Mandamus
In re Ruth Reed Dyke, Laura Hamman Fain, and Elizabeth Oliver
Yes
www.txcourts.gov/3rdcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/10/2023 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | Relator |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/17/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||||
08/17/2023 | Motion for temporary relief disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||
08/16/2023 | Submitted | | |||||
08/09/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file response disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
08/09/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file response filed |
| |||||
08/04/2023 | Order entered | Ordered |
| ||||
08/01/2023 | Motion for temporary relief filed |
| |||||
07/10/2023 | Sworn record filed | | |||||
07/10/2023 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/17/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Bank Trustee of the Ruth R. Hall Testamentary Trust F/B/O Laura H. Fain | Real party in interest | Mr. Thomas White Jr. Mr. Matt Manning |
Dyke, Ruth | Relator | Mr. Barret Armbruster Ms. Aimee Perilloux Fagan |
Fain, Laura | Relator | Ms. Aimee Perilloux Fagan Mr. Barret Armbruster |
Oliver, Elizabeth | Relator | Ms. Aimee Perilloux Fagan Mr. Barret Armbruster |
Bank Trustee of the Ruth R. Hall Testamentary Trust F/B/O Elizabeth Oliver | Real party in interest | Mr. Thomas White Jr. Mr. Matt Manning |
Thomas Dyke, as assignee of Claims of the David Hall Trust No. 1 | Real party in interest | Mr. Kevin J. Terrazas Mr. Eric Hudson Mr. Scotty Arbuckle III |
Regions Bank, as Bank Trustee of the Ruth Reed Dyke Trust No. 1 | Real party in interest | Mr. Matt Manning Mr. Thomas White Jr. |
Trial Court Information
261st District Court
Travis
Honorable Daniella DeSeta Lyttle
D-1-GN-22-001332
Rachelle Primeaux