judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KENNAMETAL, INC. VS. KINDER MORGAN ENERGY

Case Information: 55122
Short Caption:KENNAMETAL, INC. VS. KINDER MORGAN ENERGYCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 43117 , 43321
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0305326Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/05/2010 / Berry, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/22/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 09-31031
12/22/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court.
12/23/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Jenkins & Carter check no. 12071.
01/05/2010Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert G. Berry 10-00216
01/08/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 10-00723
01/08/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. - Docketing Statement. 10-00726
01/12/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 10-00926
02/11/2010MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Dismissal Agreement and Joint Motion to Dismiss Appeal 10-03848
02/11/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. -Dismissal Agreement and Joint Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 10-03852
02/18/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. 55116 and 55122. Appellant has filed a motion to dismiss these appeals. 10-04395
02/26/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP-TH 10-05184
02/26/2010Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.