Case Information: 55117 | |||
Short Caption: | LEON (ERIBERTO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 43115 , 43156 , 49904 , 49975 , 58354 , 58561 , 59697 , 69678 , 78247 , 78247-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C180840 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/07/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/22/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-31002 | |
12/22/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/25/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Due Date: 10 days. (12/3/09--Order Denying Motion to Aggregate Sentences). | 10-01931 | |
02/01/2010 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on December 3, 2009. (Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Aggregate Consecutive Life Terms.) | 10-02754 | |
02/24/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 10-04871 | |
05/07/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 8. | 10-11865 | |
05/07/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG. | 10-14953 | |
07/08/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-16513 | |
07/08/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/21/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 13, 2010. | 10-16513 |