Case Information: 51337 | |||
Short Caption: | RHODEN (YVONNE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR080209 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/27/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal for Yvonne Mary Rhoden, Appellant | 08-07632 | |
03/27/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/27/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. This fast track appeal has been docketed as an electronic case. The Nevada Supreme Court Electronic Filing Pilot Program Rules and NRAP 3C govern this case. | 08-07636 | |
03/27/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Request for Rough Draft Transcript | 08-07647 | |
04/17/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. Fast Track Statement | 08-09578 | |
04/17/2008 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Joint Appendix | 08-09579 | |
04/22/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. Fast Track Response/Confession of Error | 08-09947 | |
04/24/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Isolde Zihn stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/19/08. (SCANNED BY CLERK) | 08-10185 | |
06/11/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part, Vacating in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED IN PART AND VACATED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." The clerk of this court shall immediately issue the remittitur in this appeal. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] NNP08-WM/MC/NS | 08-14824 | |
06/11/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SCANNED BY CLERK) | 08-14837 | |
06/11/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/23/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 12, 2008. (SCANNED BY CLERK) | 08-14837 |