Case: 08-23-00002-CV
08-23-00002-CV
01/06/2023
Divorce
Susan Freeman
David Freeman
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/20/2023 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
07/27/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||||
07/27/2023 | Submitted | | |||||||
07/10/2023 | Notice of late brief |
| |||||||
06/28/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||||||
06/28/2023 | Fee paid | | |||||||
06/28/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
06/12/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
06/12/2023 | Order entered |
| |||||||
06/12/2023 | Fee paid | | |||||||
06/12/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
05/22/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
05/22/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
05/22/2023 | Fee paid | | |||||||
05/15/2023 | Notice of late brief |
| |||||||
04/17/2023 | Letter from parties or mediator concerning mediation result |
| |||||||
04/11/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
04/03/2023 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||||
03/30/2023 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||
03/28/2023 | Reporters record received not filed | | |||||||
03/10/2023 | Deadline for parties to select mediator |
| |||||||
03/01/2023 | Order entered |
| |||||||
02/01/2023 | Case stayed for mediation |
| |||||||
02/01/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||||
01/18/2023 | Fee paid |
| |||||||
01/06/2023 | Court fee due |
| |||||||
01/06/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/20/2023 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Freeman, Susan | Appellant | Hon. David E. Hilles |
Freeman, David | Appellee | Hon. James Robert Rey |
Trial Court Information
383rd District Court
El Paso
Honorable Guadalupe Rivera
2011DCM05310
Araceli Cortez