Case Information: 55157 | |||
Short Caption: | MODELFINO (MARGARET) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 49288 , 69459 , 69459-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C188877 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/26/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/29/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-31494 | |
12/29/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/27/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 10-02239 | |
04/26/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1-3. | 10-10698 | |
04/26/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/09/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-14887 | |
07/08/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-16526 | |
07/08/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/21/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 13, 2010. | 10-16526 |