Case: 14-23-00353-CV
14-23-00353-CV
05/19/2023
Miscellaneous/other civil
Nathan Winfield, Sr. and Barbara Winfield
Eagle Ranch Homeowners Association
No
www.txcourts.gov/14thcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/29/2023 | Case stored | | |||||||
08/29/2023 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
08/29/2023 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||||||
08/04/2023 | Petition for review was not filed | | |||||||
08/04/2023 | Petition for review due in Supreme Court | | |||||||
07/05/2023 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||||
07/05/2023 | Motion for rehearing enbanc due | | |||||||
07/05/2023 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||||
06/20/2023 | Judgment Issued |
| |||||||
06/20/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | DISMISSED |
| ||||||
06/19/2023 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
06/19/2023 | Submitted | | |||||||
06/15/2023 | Appellants brief due | | |||||||
06/14/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||||
06/12/2023 | Response due | | |||||||
06/05/2023 | Docketing statement due | | |||||||
06/01/2023 | Notification received that no record was taken | | |||||||
06/01/2023 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||||
06/01/2023 | Dismissal letter |
| |||||||
05/30/2023 | Document filed |
| |||||||
05/30/2023 | Statement of inability to afford costs filed in the court of appeals |
| |||||||
05/30/2023 | Court fee due | | |||||||
05/30/2023 | Record due | | |||||||
05/26/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
05/19/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
05/19/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
05/19/2023 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||||
05/18/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
05/08/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | | |||||||
05/01/2023 | Statement of inability to afford costs filed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/29/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
08/29/2029 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Winfield, Barbara | Appellant | Barbara Winfield |
Eagle Ranch Homeowners Association | Appellee | Melissa Margaret McLain |
Winfield, Senior, Nathan | Appellant | Nathan Winfield Senior |
Trial Court Information
151st District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 151st District Court
2021-23010
Court Reporter, 151st District Court