Case Information: 55145 | |||
Short Caption: | SCHWEICKERT VS. UNIVERSITY OF NEVADA, RENO | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 52097 , 55181 , 57544 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0801258 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/28/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Second Judicial District Court check no. 17166. | ||
12/28/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 09-31382 | |
01/22/2010 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Notice to the Court (regarding the caption). | 10-01856 | |
01/25/2010 | Other Incoming Document | Received Proper Person Document. (FILED PER ORDER 07/07/10). Certificate of Sevice. | 10-02004 | |
01/29/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Response to Petitioner's Notice to the Court. | 10-02587 | |
02/04/2010 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 10-03125 | |
02/04/2010 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion Requesting Leave to File a Brief in Proper Person Appeal. | 10-03126 | |
02/12/2010 | Brief | Received Amicus Brief. Via E-Flex. Amicus Curiae Brief of Real Party in Interest. Appendix is attached as document parts. | ||
03/01/2010 | Motion | Received Motion. (FILED PER ORDER 07/07/10). Motion to Strike the Amicus Curiae Brief Filed by the Nevada System of Higher Education or in the Alternative Opposition to the Amicus Curiae Brief. | 10-05285 | |
03/08/2010 | Motion | Received Proper Person Motion. (FILED PER ORDER 06/30/10). Motion to Recuse the Honorable James W. Hardesty. | 10-05973 | |
06/30/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Response to Motion to Disqualify of Justice Hardesty. Appellants/petitioners in Docket Nos. 55145 and 55181, respectively, have submitted motions seeking my recusal from further participation in these proceedings, which were provisionally received in both cases on March 8, 2010. The clerk of this court is directed to file these motions. I nonetheless voluntarily recuse myself from participation in these matters. Nos. 55145/55181. | 10-17050 | |
06/30/2010 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion to Recuse the Honorable James W. Hardesty. | 10-05973 | |
06/30/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Appendix to Motion to Recuse the Honorable James W. Hardesty. | 10-05974 | |
06/30/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Order Dismissing Appeal (Docket No. 55145) and Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition (Docket No. 55181). As we lack jurisdiction to consider this appeal "we dismiss it." SNP10-RP/MD/KP fn1[In light of this order, we deny all pending motions as moot.] Nos. 55145/55181. | 10-17058 | |
07/06/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk of this court is directed to file appellants' certificate of service, provisionally received on January 25, 2010, and their motion to strike, which was provisionally received on March 1, 2010. No action is needed with regard to the certificate of service and, in light of this court's June 30, 2010, order dismissing this appeal, the motion to strike is denied as moot. Additionally, in light of the June 30 order dismissing this appeal, the clerk of this court is directed to return, unfiled, the amicus brief provisionally received on February 2, 2010. | 10-17399 | |
07/06/2010 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Certificate of Sevice. | 10-02004 | |
07/06/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Strike the Amicus Curiae Brief Filed by the Nevada System of Higher Education or in the Alternative Opposition to the Amicus Curiae Brief. | 10-05285 | |
07/27/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-17959 | |
07/27/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/09/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 30, 2010. | 10-17959 |