Case Information: 49392 | |||
Short Caption: | MUHAMMAD (RAHIM) VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - HC0511021 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/14/2007 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/04/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/04/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-10011 | |
05/25/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 07-11578 | |
06/14/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 07-13089 | |
06/14/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
09/18/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP08G-MG/MC/NS. | 07-20592 | |
10/16/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-20653 | |
10/16/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/30/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 18, 2007. | 07-20653 |