Case Information: 51324 | |||
Short Caption: | STOREY VS. KELLEHER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 55561 , 55807 , 60101 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A533242 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/09/2008 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/26/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Tom Storey--check no. 1062. | ||
03/26/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 08-07422 | |
04/09/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 08-08840 | |
04/25/2008 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 08-10370 | |
05/08/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Appellant to Properly Serve His Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Appellant: Service due: 20 days. Appellant cautioned. | 08-11517 | |
05/21/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Certificate of Service for Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 08-12770 | |
05/29/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Record and Directing Response. District Court Record in case no. A533242 due: 30 days. Response from respondent due: 45 days. | 08-13443 | |
06/09/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1and 2. | 08-14522 | |
06/09/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/09/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Lisa Lizotte stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/22/08, 01/23/08, and 01/24/08. | 08-14541 | |
07/14/2008 | Brief | Filed Response to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Respondent's Answering Brief. | 08-17940 | |
07/14/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | 08-17945 | |
01/08/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Supplemental Record. Due: 15 days. | 09-00494 | |
01/20/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 3 and 4. (Supplemental Record-In response to order filed 01/08/09). | 09-01593 | |
12/04/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Dispositional Order/Appeal. "We therefore affirm that portion of the district court's judment. We reverse the district court's award of attorney fees to Kelleher." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-29381 | |
12/29/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-30350 | |
12/29/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 5, 2010. | 09-30350 |