judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CARTER (DANIEL) VS. STATE C/W 49403/49404/49405

Case Information: 49407
Short Caption:CARTER (DANIEL) VS. STATE C/W 49403/49404/49405Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 49403 *, 49404 , 49405 , 49407Related Case(s): 44126
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR031942Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/22/2007How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/08/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/08/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 07-10190
05/25/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. 07-11599
07/02/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 07-14365
08/22/2007Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. 07-18626
08/22/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/10/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED AND we REMAND these matters to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP08G-MG/MC/NS. fn14[This order constitutes our final disposition of this appeal. Any subsequent appeal shall be docketed as a new matter.] Nos. 49403/49404/49405/49407. 07-26697
01/04/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-00060
01/04/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/09/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 7, 2008. 08-00060