judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEELE VS. STATE ENGINEER

Case Information: 49411
Short Caption:STEELE VS. STATE ENGINEERCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34787 , 38848
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9900270Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/08/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Second Judicial District Court--check no. 14216.
05/08/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) 07-10246
06/04/2007MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Appellant to file Briefs and Set Aside Pilot Program Order. 07-12152
06/08/2007MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Appellant to file Briefs and Set Aside Pilot Program Order. 07-12609
06/14/2007MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Extension of Time in Filing Reply to Opposition to Motion for Appellant to fie Briefs and Set Aside Pilot Program Order. 07-13022
06/18/2007MotionReceived Proper Person Response. Reply to Opposition to Motion for Appellant to file Briefs and Set Aside Pilot Program Order. FILED PER ORDER OF 8/8/07. 07-13286
06/18/2007BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 07-13287
06/21/2007Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Notice of Correction. 07-13549
08/08/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Transmission of Record, Granting Motion for Exemption from Pilot Program and to Allow Appellant to File Briefs, and Establishing Briefing Schedule. Record from District Court Clerk due: 30 days. If appellant wishes to obtain transcripts not already included in the district court record, she shall file a transcript request with 15 days of this order. Opening Brief due: 60 days. Fn1[. . .we direct the clerk of this court to file the reply. We deny as moot appellant's June 14, 2007 motion for an extension to file a reply. Fn5 [We deny respondent's request that, if appellant is allowed to filed briefs, she be required to submit an appendix and cite to the appendix, rather than the record, in her briefs.] 07-17397
08/08/2007MotionFiled Proper Person Response. Reply to Opposition to Motion for Appellant to file Briefs and Set Aside Pilot Program Order. 07-13286
09/14/2007Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 4. 07-20352
10/02/2007BriefFiled Opening Brief. 07-21698
10/30/2007BriefFiled Answering Brief. 07-23806
11/29/2007MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Extension of Time in Filing Pursuant to NRAP 26(b). 07-25794
12/04/2007MotionFiled Response to Motion. Notice of Non-Opposition. 07-26192
12/06/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Reply Brief due: 12/10/07. 07-26320
12/10/2007BriefFiled Reply Brief. 07-26784
12/31/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Corrections and Further Facts to the Court and Request for this Court's Order of Injunction. 07-28289
01/08/2008MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Withdraw of Motion for Court's Order of Injunction. 08-00500
01/11/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district cout's order denying Steele's petition for judicial review." Fn9 [. . . We grant Steele's January 8, 2008 request to withdraw her December 31, 2007 motion for injunctive relief from this court.] SNP08-JH/RP/MD. 08-00841
01/22/2008MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion in Charge for Voluntary Recusal/Disqualification of Honorable Justices Hardesty and Parraguirre Pursuant to NRS 1.225(2)(a), et. al. 08-01594
01/30/2008MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion in Charge for Voluntary Recusal/Disqualification of Honorable Justices Hardesty and Parraguirre Pursuant to NRS1.225(2)(A), et.al. 08-02414
02/01/2008Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Letter addressed to Justice Maupin dated January 31, 2008 regarding Petition for Reconsideration and draft motion. 08-02594
02/05/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-02097
02/05/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/06/2008MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion to Explain the Reason for Not Having Completed and Filing the Appellant's Motion for Reconsideration Pursuant to NRAP 40 and Motion for Reconsideration (NRAP 40). 08-02974
02/11/2008MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Notice of Clericial Correction and Reply to Opposition to Motion in Charge for Voluntary Resucsal/Disqualification on Honorable Justices Hardesty and Parraguirre Pursuant to NRS 1.225(2)(A), et al. 08-03403
02/12/2008MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to the Motion to Explain the Reason for Not Having Completed and Filing the Appellant's Motion for Reconsideration Pursuant to NRAP 40 and Motion for Reconsideration (NRAP 40). 08-03492
02/15/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 13, 2008. 08-02097
02/15/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Respondent's Clarification and Notice of Errata. 08-03840
03/10/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Denying Motion for Disqualifications and Petition for Rehearing. We have already ruled on the merits in ths case, appellant has waived any ground for disqualification by failing to timely file a formal request for recusal, and we therefore deny her motion. We deny appellant's petition for rehearing. fn2[We grant appellant' request to excuse the untimely filing of her petition, which we deem her "motion for reconsideration" to be. Appellant has requested that we postpone ruling on her rehearing petition until the appeal in an unrelated water law case, Docket No. 47878, has been decided, she has failed to demonstrate that our resolution of any of the issues raised in that case would impact this matter in any way. We deny her request.] fn7[We deny appellant's request for an additional extension of time in which to submit a document more specifically addressing each of the issues she believes that we have overlooked or misapprehended.] 08-05867