Case Information: 49418 | |||
Short Caption: | CHOKA (LESLIE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 0700176A | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/10/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/10/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-10429 | |
06/06/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP07-RP/JH/NS | 07-12388 | |
07/03/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-13535 | |
07/03/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/10/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 5, 2007. | 07-13535 |