judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FIELDS (LINDA) VS. STATE

Case Information: 49417
Short Caption:FIELDS (LINDA) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 56987 , 57117 , 65276
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CRFP062253Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:11/13/2008 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:11/13/2008How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/10/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/10/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 07-10420
05/29/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-11711
05/29/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Request for Transcripts of Proceedings. 07-11713
05/31/2007Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form. 07-11998
06/11/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/15/07, 03/01/07, 03/12/07-03/23/07, and 03/28/07. To Court Reporter: Tia Lange. 07-12753
07/11/2007TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 02/15/07, 03/01/07, 03/14/07, 03/15/07,03/16/07, 03/20/07, 03/21/07, 03/22/07, 03/23/07 and 03/28/07. Court Reporter: Tia Lange. 07-15075
09/04/2007MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: October 5, 2007. 07-19444
09/04/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/12/07 through 3/23/07 and 3/28/07. To Court Reporter: Tia Lange. 07-19445
10/01/2007TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Tia Lange stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. 07-21645
10/09/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. in the interest of judicial efficiency, we elect to apply the amended version of NRAP 9(b) to the transcript listed in Ms. Lange's notice. Appellant shall include copies of the transcripts requested in the second transcript request form in the appendix to the opening brief, and Ms. Lange is not obligated to file a copy of the transcript in this court. 07-22207
10/09/2007MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation for Extension of Time to file Appellant's Opening Brief. 07-22227
10/19/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Time for filing Opening Brief extended to 11/5/07. 07-23061
11/06/2007MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 50 pages. Opening Brief. 07-24243
11/06/2007BriefFiled Opening Brief. 07-24244
11/06/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 07-24245
12/04/2007BriefFiled Answering Brief. 07-26121
12/04/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 07-26123
01/08/2008BriefFiled Reply Brief. 08-00518
09/26/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on November 13, 2008 at 1:30 p.m. (NNP08G-WM/MC/NS) 08-24918
10/29/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 08-27754
11/12/2008MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Motion for Allowance of Additional Time for Oral Argument (filed via fax). 08-28800
11/12/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Oral argument is expanded to 60 minutes, allowing 30 minutes per side. 08-28841
11/13/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP08G-MG/MC/NS.
12/10/2009Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons. Author: Cherry, Michael A.. Majority: Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons. 125 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 57. NNP09/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons. 09-29872
12/21/2009Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 02/01/10). Respondent's Petition Pursuant to NRAP 40A for En Banc Reconsideration. 09-30904
02/01/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court is directed to strike the petition filed on December 21, 2009. 10-02682
02/04/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Publishers re: corrections to opinions filed in 2009. Nos.49008, 52110, 49029, 53596/54238, 51941, 49417, 50497, 51162, 47851 10-03339
02/08/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Linda Fields in response to her letter received 2/5/10. 10-03477
02/16/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-03970
02/16/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/23/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 18, 2010. 10-03970