Case Information: 49395 | |||
Short Caption: | TRACY VS. ZURICH NORTH AMERICAN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 32641 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/07/2007 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/04/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
05/04/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 07-10026 | |
05/09/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. Second notice of appeal filed 5/7/07 | 07-10325 | |
05/10/2007 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 07-10388 | |
05/10/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 07-10442 | |
05/24/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from World Prayers Answered (Linwood Edward Tracy Jr.). | ||
06/28/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Strike. Respondent's Motion to Strike Appeal. | 07-14132 | |
07/24/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due in District Court Case no. CV-0032641. Due: 30 days. Fn3 [We defer ruling on respondents' June 28, 2007 motion to strike.] | 07-16227 | |
07/27/2007 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Motion to Quash Respondents Motion to Strike. | 07-16598 | |
08/07/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. | 07-17275 | |
08/07/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
08/10/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Respondents' Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Quash Respondents' Motion to Strike Appellant's Appeal. | 07-17681 | |
08/17/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to the Motion of Respondents Brief without Date of Filing or Signature as Received 8/14/07. | 07-18207 | |
09/10/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn5[In light of this order, we deny as moot all requests for relief currently pending in this appeal. The clerk of this court shall modify the caption to conform with the caption of this order.] SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 07-19840 | |
09/25/2007 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Notice of Default. | 07-21103 | |
10/30/2007 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "We deny Rehearing." Fn4 [. . .In addittion to denying rehearing, we deny all further relief requested in appellant's "Notice of Appeal" and all relief requested in the September 25 "Notice of Default"]. | 07-23779 | |
10/30/2007 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. "Notice of Appeal." | 07-20271 | |
11/28/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-25623 | |
11/28/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/10/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 5, 2007. | 07-25623 |