Case Information: 49396 | |||
Short Caption: | RIVERA VS. PHILIP MORRIS, INC. (NRAP 5) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | NONE | Classification: | Original Proceeding - NRAP 5 - U.S. District Court |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | 12/02/2008 at 11:00 AM | Oral Argument Location: | Carson City |
Submission Date: | 12/02/2008 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/04/2007 | Order/Incoming | Filed Order Certifying Question to Nevada Supreme Court. Received from U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada . | 07-10034 | |
05/07/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. to pay Filing Fee. This matter involves a legal question certified to this court by the United States District Court for the District of Nevada pursuant to NRAP 5. The order of the certifying court does not address the payment of this court's fees. The fee shall be divided between appellants and respondent and each shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, tender to the clerk of this court the sum of $125.00, representing one half of the filing fee. | 07-10112 | |
05/14/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $125.00 from Shook firm - check no. 643252. | ||
05/15/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $125.00 from Johnson Flora, PLLC-check no. 9852. | ||
05/24/2007 | Other | Returned Mail. Receipt for documents dated 05/14/07, addressed to Holman & Associates returned. No forwarding address. | ||
05/29/2007 | Other | Returned Mail. Two Receipts for documents dated 05/14/07 and 05/15/07, addressed to Shook Hardy & Bacon, LLP, returned. No forwarding address. | ||
11/20/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Briefing. Appellants shall have forty-five days from the date of this order to file and serve a joint opening brief. Respondent's answering brief due: 30 days. Appellant's reply brief due: 20 days. The parties are directed to file a joint appendix due no later than the date the opening brief is filed. | 07-25366 | |
11/30/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Time to File Opening Brief. | 07-25956 | |
12/10/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address. (Bailey-Merrill, LLP) | 07-26797 | |
12/20/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Time to File Opening Brief. | 07-27626 | |
12/28/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant's shall have 90 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. fn1[The motion filed on November 30, 2007, is denied as moot.] | 07-28230 | |
01/11/2008 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 12/28/07 addressed to Shook Hardy & Bacon in Kansas City, MO re-mailed to corrected address. | 08-00756 | |
03/28/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-07738 | |
03/28/2008 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols 1-5. | 08-07739 | |
04/29/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-10702 | |
04/29/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | 08-10703 | |
05/19/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-12498 | |
05/19/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Appellant's Opening Brief and Reply Brief on Respondent Counsel Desmond w/Jones Vargas. | 08-12513 | |
07/21/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Appellant's Motion to Associate Counsel. | 08-18788 | |
07/21/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Appellant's Motion to Associate Counsel | 08-18789 | |
07/30/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Appellant's Motion to Associate Counsel. | 08-19669 | |
08/06/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. We grant the motion to associate pro hac vice attorney Mark Alan Johnson of the law firm of Johnson Flora, PLLC. SCR 42(8). Mr. Johnson shall be permitted to appear on behalf of appellants in this appeal. Nevada attorney Gerald I. Gillock of Gillock, Markley & Killebrew, P.C. shall be responsible for all matters presented by Mr. Johnson in this appeal. | 08-20412 | |
10/09/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on December 2, 2008 at 11:00 a.m. (En Banc) | 08-26035 | |
11/07/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Respondent's Motion to Associate Counsel. | 08-28538 | |
11/17/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Gregory Stone of the law firm of Munger, Tolles & Olson, LLP, shall be permitted to appear on behalf of respondent in this appeal. Nevada attorney John Desmond of the Jones Vargas law firm shall be responsible for all matters presented by Mr. Stone in this appeal. | 08-29192 | |
11/17/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | 08-29232 | |
12/02/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/04/2009 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Question Answered." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Saitta, Nancy M.. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons. 125 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 18. EN BANC. Fn2 [The Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] | 09-13970 | |
06/30/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 09-15190 | |
06/30/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |