judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36296
Short Caption:STATE VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C141534Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/16/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/16/2000Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. 00-10281
06/16/2000Petition/WritFiled Exhibits to Petition for Writ. 00-10283
06/20/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Affidavit of the party beneficially interested or the affidavit of petitioner's attorney, and copies of the judgment or order challenged by the petition. Due Date: 10 days
06/29/2000Petition/WritFiled Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ. Affidavit and Transcirpts of Order re: Petition for Writ of Prohibition or in the Alternative, a Writ of Mandamus. 00-11080
08/18/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. " . . . we deny the petition." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-14501
09/13/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-14689
09/13/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.