judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PHILLIP ANTHONY BROWN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1146
Short Caption:PHILLIP ANTHONY BROWN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-537-09Filed Date:09/08/2010

Opening Event Date:09/08/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/24/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/02/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPhillip A. Brown Y
Nancy E. AllenNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/08/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/21/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Nancy E. Allen, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
09/21/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Nancy E. Allen, Esquire
10/01/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
12/15/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (8 pgs/tape) 4/20/10 proc.
12/15/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (31 pgs/Johnson) 4/21/10 proc. p.m.
12/15/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (85 pgs/Johnson) 4/21/10 proc. p.m.
12/15/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (21 pgs/tape) 4/29/10 proc.
12/15/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (8 pgs/tape) 7/23/10 proc. w/cd
12/20/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/29/2010RECORD INDEX
12/29/2010RECORD COPIES
01/07/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
01/12/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 2, 2011. (JAC)
02/25/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until after completion of transcript (no oppo).
03/10/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, wherein appellant indicate(s) that transcript is being prepared, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the brief of appellant shall be filed within 40 days from the date the transcript is filed with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall advise this court within 15 days thereof of appellant's_ receipt of the ordered transcript. (JAC)
03/24/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (6 pgs/tape) 1/29/09 proc.
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (4 pgs/tape) 2/26/09 proc.
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (6 pgs/tape) 4/23/09 proc.
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (8 pgs/tape) 4/30/09 proc.
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (7 pgs/tape) 5/22/09 proc.
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (10 pgs/tape) 5/27/09 proc.
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (7 pgs/tape) 9/9/10 proc.
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (7 pgs/tape) 11/25/09 proc.
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (6 pgs/tape) 1/15/10 proc. (no cd)
03/31/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 10, 2011, wherein appellant was directed to file the brief within 40 days from the date the transcript is filed with this court, and it appearing that all transcripts have been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall file the brief and the limited appendix within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/27/2011FiledCOUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) w/aplt's brief & appdx.Granted
04/27/2011FiledTMC/MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS)
05/05/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL NO LATER THAN MAY 25, 2011 FILE ANY RESPONSE showing why counsel's motion should not be granted...SEE HARDCOPY It is FURTHER ORDERED that the MOTION TO WITHDRAW IS HELD IN ABEYANCE... (BY: ETW)
06/02/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO STAY RULING on Anders Motion LW
06/02/2011NOTICE RECEIVED - counsel for aplt forwarding aplt's current address...P.O. box 7732, Woodbridge, Va. & and for more time to respond to motion to withdraw.
06/20/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION TO STAY IS GRANTED to the extent that counsel shall w/n 60 DAYS, either file notice with this court of counsel's decision to file a DC CODE 23-110 MOTION OR FILE A MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE ANDERS MOTION. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to withdaw is HELD IN ABEYANCE... (BY: ETW)
08/23/2011FiledNotice Received - 23-110 motion will not be filed (Appellant)
10/06/2011FiledOrder Granting MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS)
10/06/2011FiledAffirmed
11/02/2011FiledMandate