judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EDMOND A. COOK v. IVAN EDDY

Case Heading (S-07-0272)
Case Number:S-07-0272Case Docketed On:11/27/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Niobrara CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:EDMOND A. COOK v. IVAN EDDY
Full Title:EDMOND A. COOK, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. IVAN EDDY, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantEdmond A. CookJames A. Eddington
AppelleeIvan EddyFrank D. Peasley

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Property - Real - Adverse Possession
Opinion Number:2008 WY 111
Citation:193 P.3d 705 (Wyo. 2008)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/27/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/27/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/27/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/14/2008Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
01/17/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from counsel for appellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
02/28/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from appelleeNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
03/10/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/18/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/21/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/26/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
03/26/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, exhibits (plus an oversized exhibit hand delivered and stored separately); volumes III-IV, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/26/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/23/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/09/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/09/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/09/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/09/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/15/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 10/14/08.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
10/17/2008Event - Phone Call. Spoke to both Mr. Eddington & Peasley on 10/9/08 regarding the oversized exhibit. Mr. Peasley hand carried it to us originally. Mr. Eddington designated it. It is Mr. Peasley's exhibit. Mr. Peasley said to hold on to exhibit for one week. If he didn't pick it up to destroy it. Exhibit destroyed this date.EventPhone CallFinal