judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GALATZ VS. STATE BAR OF NEVADA

Case Information: 49406
Short Caption:GALATZ VS. STATE BAR OF NEVADACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A534444Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:05/18/2007 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/10/2008How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/08/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Neil G. Galatz - check no. 4534.
05/08/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 07-10191
05/08/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days. 07-10193
05/10/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. 07-10408
05/18/2007Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. 07-11012
06/01/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 07-12035
06/01/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-12123
06/07/2007Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received on June 1, 2007. 07-12510
06/07/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-12124
07/23/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 07-16002
07/27/2007Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 07-16585
08/15/2007Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 07-18010
10/30/2007MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: November 13, 2007. 07-23756
11/13/2007MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Vacate Clerk's Grant of Appellant's "Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief" and to Dismiss Appeal. 07-24651
11/21/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Telephone Number and Facsimile. 07-25452
11/28/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension to File Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Vacate Clerk's Grant of Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Appellant's Opening Brief and to Dismiss Appeal. 07-25612
11/28/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 07-24891
11/28/2007BriefFiled Opening Brief. 07-24997
12/05/2007MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Vacate Clerk's Grant of Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Appellant's Opening Brief and to Dismiss Appeal. (STRICKEN PER ORDER OF 12/07/07.) 07-26270
12/07/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Respondent's motion to vacate the clerk's grant of appellant's motion for extension of time is denied. The appellant's motion for an extension of time to file an opposition to respondent's motion is denied as moot. The clerk shall strike the document entitled "Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Vacate Clerk's Grant of Appellant's Motion for Extension to file Appellant's Opening Brief and to Dismiss Appeal" from the docket in this appeal. 07-26542
12/17/2007MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. (Gunderson). Brief due: January 16, 2007. 07-27267
12/21/2007MotionFiled Motion. State Bar's Joinder in Gunderson's Motion to Vacate Clerk's Grant of Extension of Time for appellant to File Opening Brief and to Dismiss Appeal; and Reply to Appellant's Opposition thereto. 07-27708
12/21/2007BriefFiled Answering Brief. Answering Brief of the Respondent State Bar of Nevada Fee Dispute Arbitration Committee. 07-27709
01/07/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent Elmer M. Gunderson. 08-00425
01/11/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The State Bar's joinder is denied as moot. 08-00840
02/08/2008MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: March 7, 2008. 08-03209
03/10/2008BriefFiled Reply Brief. 08-05926
09/10/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. 08-23422
09/10/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/27/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Supplemental Briefing. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a supplemental opening brief. Respondents shall then have 30 days from the date appellant's supplemental opening brief is filed and served to file and serve their supplemental answering brief. Appellant may file any reply to respondents' supplemental answering briefs within 15 days of the date that the answering brief is filed and served. 09-18246
08/28/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension to File Supplemental Briefing. 09-21030
09/10/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Additional Time to File and Serve Supplemental Opening Brief. We deny appellant's motion as moot. We nonetheless direct the clerk of this court to file the supplemental opening brief. 09-21976
09/10/2009BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Appellants. 09-21753
10/07/2009BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Respondent Elmer Gunderson. 09-24479
10/13/2009BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. of Respondent State Bar of Nevada Fee Dispute Arbitration Committee 09-24984
10/29/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension to File Supplemental Reply Brief. 09-26570
11/06/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Reply Brief. Supplemental Reply Brief due: November 9, 2009. 09-27199
11/12/2009BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. Appellant's Reply to Respondents' Supplemental Brief. 09-27601
12/23/2009MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to Submit Supplemental Authority. 09-31133
01/14/2010MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave to File Out-of-Time Response to Appellant's "Motion for Leave to Submit Supplemental Authority" and Conditional Statement of Non-Opposition to Such Motion. 10-01165
02/05/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Supplemental Authority. In resolving this appeal, this court will consider the discussion contained in Galatz's December 23, 2009, motion. Respondent Elmber M. Gunderson's Response due: 10 days. 10-03379
02/19/2010MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Respondent Elmer M. Gunderson's Response to Appellant Neil G. Galatz's Supplemental Authority. 10-04572
06/17/2010MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. and Motion for Remand. 10-15885
06/28/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, this appeal is hereby dismissed. EN BANC-RP fn1[Although the parties have also requested that this court remand the matter to the district court for consideraton of their stipulation to vacate the judgment and dismiss the case, we deny that request.] 10-16714
06/28/2010Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.