Case Information: 49415 | |||
Short Caption: | FIGUEROA VS. SOUTHWEST RANCH HOMEOWNERS C/W 49577 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 49415*, 49577 | Related Case(s): | 49577 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A528965 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 05/22/2007 / Buchanan, William | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/09/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Bell and Young, Ltd.--check no. 108974. | ||
05/09/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 07-10372 | |
05/22/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. | 07-11266 | |
05/25/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-11615 | |
05/25/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. - Docketing Statement. | 07-11621 | |
05/29/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | 07-11680 | |
06/01/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. | 07-12060 | |
06/25/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: June 28, 2007. Nos. 49415/49577-cases are not consolidated. | 07-13813 | |
07/16/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 49415/49577-cases are not consolidated. | 07-15382 | |
12/11/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Consolidating Appeals and Reinstating Briefing. We consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellants: 15 days from the date of this order to request transcripts. 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve a single opening brief and appendix. Nos. 49415/49577. | 07-26906 | |
12/26/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/15/07 and 4/19/07. To Court Reporter: Richard Kangas. Nos. 49415/49577. | 07-27923 | |
02/13/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Richard Kangas to file certificate of delivery of transcripts. Due date: 10 days. Nos. 49415/49577 | 08-03527 | |
02/26/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Patricia Slattery stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/15/07 and 4/19/07. Nos. 49415/49577. (08-04651) | 08-04651 | |
03/11/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Nos. 49415/49577. (08-06074) | 08-06074 | |
03/11/2008 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Nos. 49415/49577. (08-06075) | 08-06075 | |
04/11/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Nos. 49415/49577. (08-09048). | 08-09048 | |
05/07/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Nos. 49415/49577. (08-11405). | 08-11405 | |
09/08/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment challenged in Docket No. 49415 AFFIRMED and VACATE the May 10, 2007, order challenged in Docket No. 49577." We therefore direct the district court to vacate the May 10, 2007, order granting rehearing and affirming its prior order. SNP08-JH/RP/MD Nos. 49415/49577. | 08-23039 | |
10/03/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-23288 | |
10/03/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/13/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 7, 2008., | 08-23288 |