Case Information: 49416 | |||
Short Caption: | BEVERLY (TODD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 42767 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C170253 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/22/2007 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/10/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/10/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-10409 | |
05/25/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Order due: 30 days. Record on appeal due: 60 days. | 07-11583 | |
06/18/2007 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on June 13, 2007. | 07-13254 | |
06/22/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols.1 through 8. | 07-13731 | |
06/22/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/28/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. | 07-14111 | |
10/31/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP08G-MG/MC/NS. | 07-23922 | |
11/28/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-25152 | |
11/28/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/06/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 3, 2007. | 07-25152 | |
01/11/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. for Leave to file Documents. In light of the disposition of appellant's appeal, the motion is moot. | 08-00768 |