Case Information: 49398 | |||
Short Caption: | ST. JAMES VILLAGE, INC. VS. CUNNINGHAM | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0602801 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | 05/17/2007 / Olsen, Philip | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | 10/16/2008 at 1:00 PM | Oral Argument Location: | Regional Justice Center |
Submission Date: | 10/16/2008 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/08/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from McDonald firm - check no. 62157. | ||
05/08/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 07-10171 | |
05/15/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-10813 | |
05/17/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Philip A. Olsen. | 07-10925 | |
05/30/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for August 22, 2007, at 10:00 a.m. | 07-11862 | |
08/27/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 07-18951 | |
09/12/2007 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 07-20118 | |
09/24/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 07-21018 | |
12/03/2007 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 07-26088 | |
12/03/2007 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 07-26089 | |
12/21/2007 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 1, 2008. | 07-27678 | |
01/31/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-02548 | |
02/28/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: April 2, 2008. | 08-04906 | |
04/02/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-08207 | |
08/26/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on October 16, 2008 at 1:00 p.m. (SNP08-JH/RP/MD) | 08-21951 | |
10/02/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | 08-25440 | |
10/16/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP08-JH/RP/MD | ||
06/25/2009 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Hardesty, James W. : Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons.fn1-[The Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] 125 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 21. EN BANC. | 09-15719 | |
07/13/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150 from McDonald firm - check no. 71914. | ||
07/13/2009 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. Appellant St. James's Village, Inc. Petition for Rehearing. | 09-17219 | |
09/15/2009 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 09-22383 | |
10/13/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-23308 | |
10/13/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/16/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 15, 2009. | 09-23308 |