Case: 14-22-00411-CV
14-22-00411-CV
06/08/2022
Contract
Larry A. Seligmann, Lasco Development Corporation, Yorktown Hwy 6 GP, Inc.
Bancorpsouth Bank, N.A.
No
www.txcourts.gov/14thcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/13/2022 | Case stored | | |||||||
10/13/2022 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
10/13/2022 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||||||
09/19/2022 | Petition for review was not filed | | |||||||
09/19/2022 | Petition for review due in Supreme Court | | |||||||
08/19/2022 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||||
08/19/2022 | Motion for rehearing enbanc due | | |||||||
08/19/2022 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||||
08/04/2022 | Motion to dismiss disposed | GRANTED | | ||||||
08/04/2022 | Judgment Issued |
| |||||||
08/04/2022 | Memorandum opinion issued | DISMISSED |
| ||||||
08/03/2022 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
08/03/2022 | Submitted | | |||||||
07/21/2022 | Reporters record due | | |||||||
07/21/2022 | Response due | | |||||||
07/14/2022 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||||
07/06/2022 | Notice of late record |
| |||||||
07/06/2022 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||||
07/05/2022 | Record due | | |||||||
06/23/2022 | Mediation docketing statement due | | |||||||
06/23/2022 | Docketing statement due | | |||||||
06/20/2022 | Court fee due | | |||||||
06/13/2022 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||||
06/10/2022 | Fee paid |
| |||||||
06/08/2022 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
06/08/2022 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
06/08/2022 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||||
06/06/2022 | Amended notice of appeal filed | | |||||||
06/03/2022 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
04/05/2022 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||||
03/07/2022 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/13/2022 | Case Stored | Case stored |
10/13/2028 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Bancorpsouth Bank, N.A. | Appellee | Michael J. Durrschmidt Kim Lewinski |
Larry A. Seligmann, Lasco Development Corporation, Yorktown Hwy 6 GP, Inc. | Appellant | Keith Miles Aurzada Bradley Purcell |
Trial Court Information
189th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 189th District Court
2020-09575
Amanda Lynn King