Case Information: 51317 | |||
Short Caption: | CHRISTIE (JOHN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 54148 , 56430 , 58696 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR071223 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 02/02/2009 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/25/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/25/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 08-07305 | |
03/27/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. | 08-07613 | |
03/31/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. to Withdraw as Counsel and Motion to Extend Time for Appellant to File Docketing Statement. | 08-08018 | |
04/16/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. . Attorney Henry Sotelo's service of the motion to withdraw as counsel of record on appellant due: 7 days. Appellant's obligation to file a docketing statement is suspended pending further order of this court. | 08-09543 | |
04/18/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Affidavit of Service. Motion to Withdraw as Counsel and Motion to Extend Time to File Docketing Statement served on appellant John Christi. | 08-09687 | |
04/29/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. . We grant attorney Henry Sotelo's motion to withdraw as counsel of record for appellant in this appeal. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. District court order due 35 days. Briefing and compliance with NRAP 9 and 14 are stayed pending further order of this court. | 08-10659 | |
06/05/2008 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Filed copy of order filed in district court on June 2, 2008 appointing the Washoe County Public Defender as counsel for appellant. | 08-14213 | |
06/05/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Appointed Counsel. Docketing statement due: 15 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days | 08-14214 | |
06/10/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for appellant. | 08-14702 | |
06/30/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. . We again remand this appeal for the limited purpose of securing conflict-free counsel for appellant. District Court Order due: 30 days. Briefing and compliance with NRAP 9 and 14 are stayed pending further notification from this court. The notice issued by the clerk of this court on June 5, 2008, reinstating the briefing schedule, is hereby vacated. | 08-16536 | |
07/25/2008 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 07/23/08. Thomas Qualls, Esq. appointed as counsel. | 08-19247 | |
07/25/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Appointed Counsel. Docketing statement due: 15 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days | 08-19249 | |
08/12/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/19/07, 11/15/07, 2/14/08. To Court Reporter: Captions Unlimited. | 08-20810 | |
08/12/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-20811 | |
08/12/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Due date: 10 days. | 08-20814 | |
08/14/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Request for Transcript of Proceedings. | 08-21026 | |
08/18/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Denise Phipps stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 6/19/07, 11/15/07, and 2/14/08. | 08-21288 | |
08/19/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Amended Certificate of Service (Request for Transcript of Proceedings). | 08-21367 | |
08/22/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Barbara Johnson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/14/08. | 08-21722 | |
09/17/2008 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 09/12/08. | 08-24045 | |
11/24/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-29969 | |
11/24/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 08-29970 | |
12/16/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-31878 | |
01/14/2009 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 09-01174 | |
01/14/2009 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. | ||
02/02/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 09-02782 | |
02/02/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
03/04/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-05548 | |
03/31/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-06771 | |
03/31/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/13/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 3, 2009. | 09-06771 |