Case Information: 49419 | |||
Short Caption: | SPARKS (JASON) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 43656 , 46021 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C202232 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/19/2007 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/10/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/10/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-10432 | |
05/25/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 07-11624 | |
07/19/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. | 07-15799 | |
07/19/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
09/07/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. | 07-19715 | |
10/02/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-19785 | |
10/02/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/12/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 4, 2007. | 07-19785 |