Case Information: 49389 | |||
Short Caption: | WILHITE VS. KOLOB PLUMBING CO. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 48637 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A444748 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Maupin | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 05/09/2007 / Haberfeld, Stephen | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/04/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Mainor firm - check no. 196789. | ||
05/04/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) CASE ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED PER ORDER FILED JUNE 16, 2007--DOCUMENT TRANSFERRED TO DOCKET NO. 48637. | 07-09998 | |
05/09/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. | 07-10269 | |
05/14/2007 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Maupin. | ||
05/21/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. CASE ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED PER ORDER FILED JUNE 16, 2007--DOCUMENT TRANSFERRED TO DOCKET NO. 48637. | 07-11111 | |
05/24/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 48637/49389-cases are not consolidated. | 07-11464 | |
06/15/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order to Administratively Close Docket. The clerk shall transfer the Notice of Appeal and Docketing Statement filed under Docket No. 49389 to Docket No. 48637. | 07-13122 | |
06/15/2007 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |