judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KOKOS VS. SOUTHERN NEV. ENVIRONMENTAL C/W 48211

Case Information: 49388
Short Caption:KOKOS VS. SOUTHERN NEV. ENVIRONMENTAL C/W 48211Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 48211 *, 49388Related Case(s): 48211
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A472722Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:02/11/2009 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:02/11/2009How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/04/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
05/04/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/No Settlement. Notice of exemption from settlement conference program mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 07-09962
05/04/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days. 07-09964
05/04/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days. 07-09965
07/24/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to comply with this court's notices. Filing fee and case appeal statement due: 10 days. We further note that appellant has failed to file the docketing statement or to request the preparation of transcripts. Docketing statement and request transcripts due: 10 days. We caution appellant's counsel that failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 07-16136
08/08/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Enlargement of Time to file Appellant's Docketing Statement, Case Appeal Statement and Filing Fee. 07-17495
08/08/2007Docketing StatementReceived Docketing Statement. 07-17496
08/08/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsReceived Case Appeal Statement. 07-17497
08/08/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Graziadei & Cantor, Ltd.-check no. 21338.
08/10/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Receipt of Transcript of Proceedings. 07-17684
08/24/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. granting motion for an extension of time filed on August 8, 2007. The clerk shall file the docketing statement and case appeal statement received in August 8, 2007. fn1[We note that on August 10, 2007, appellant untimely filed the notice of receipt of transcript of proceedings in lieu of the transcript request form, indicating that she will attached the requested transcripts to the appendix to the opening brief.] 07-18838
08/24/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-17496
08/24/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. 07-17497
09/04/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Second Request. 07-19429
09/26/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-21283
09/27/2007MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Motion to Consolidate and Motion for Stay Pending Resolution of Bankruptcy Petition. Nos. 48211/49388-cases are not consolidated. 07-21342
09/27/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. In light of the foregoing consolidation, we elect to treat the motion filed on September 4, 2007, in Docket No. 49388 as though it were filed in both appeals. Cause appearing, the motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. The clerk shall file the opening briefs and appendices received in Docket Nos. 48211 and 49388. Respondent shall file a single answering brief to both opening briefs filed by appellant. fn2[We deny, as moot, appellant's September 26, 2007, motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief and appendix in Docket No. 49388.] Nos. 48211/49388 (07-21424).
09/27/2007BriefFiled Opening Brief. Filed in 49388 only. Nos. 48211/49388. 07-21286
09/27/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Filed in 49388 only. Nos. 48211/49388. 07-21287
09/27/2007BriefFiled Opening Brief. Filed in 48211 only. Nos. 48211/49388 (07-21284).
09/27/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. Filed in 48211 only. Nos. 48211/49388 (07-21285).
10/08/2007MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Stay pending Resolution of Bankruptcy Petition. Nos. 48211/49388. (07-22085)
10/17/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy for Appellant's Opposition to Motion for Stay Pending Resolution of Bankruptcy Petition. Nos. 48211/49388. (07-22923)
11/20/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We conclude that it is likely that this appeal does not constitute a continuation of an action against appellant. We deny respondents' motion to stay. Respondent's answering brief due: 30 days. Nos. 48211/49388 (07-25279).
12/26/2007BriefFiled Answering Brief. Nos. 48211/49388 (07-27940).
01/23/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Nos. 48211/49388 (08-01752).
02/06/2008Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. . Reply Brief due: March 5, 2008. Nos. 48211/49388 (08-02948).
02/11/2008MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondent's Non-Opposition to Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Reply Brief. Nos. 48211/49388 (08-03367).
03/11/2008BriefFiled Reply Brief. Nos. 48211/49388 (08-06053).
03/11/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Second Request) Nos. 48211/49388. (08-06085)
03/21/2008Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Granting Motion. Cause appearing and notwithstanding its untimeliness, appellant's motion for a second extension of time to file the reply brief is granted. Fn1[The reply brief was filed on March 11, 2008.] Nos. 48211/49388 (08-06962).
05/28/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Graziadei & Cantor, Ltd. Regarding the transmission of the missing appendix to the opening brief. 08-13420
06/12/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Replacement appendix to Appellant per letter issued 5/28/08. Nos. 48211/49388. 08-15005
11/24/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on February 11, 2009 at 2:00 p.m. (NNP09-MC/NS/MG) Nos. 48211/49388. 08-29957
01/28/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 48211/49388. 09-02480
02/11/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/21/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP09-MC/NS/MG. Nos. 48211/49388. 09-12613
06/16/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-13960
06/16/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/22/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 18, 2009. 09-13960