Case Information: 49422 | |||
Short Caption: | LAW OFFICES OF BARRY LEVINSON VS. MILKO C/W 47713 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 47713 *, 49422 | Related Case(s): | 57732 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A509413 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 01/30/2008 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/11/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from J. Michael McGroarty, Chtd.--check no. 23222. | ||
05/11/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 07-10456 | |
05/21/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Documents. It has been determined that this appeal willl not be scheduled for settlement conference. Transcript request form due: 15 days. Opening Brief due: 120 days. | 07-11106 | |
05/31/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-11953 | |
06/19/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. | 07-13376 | |
06/25/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/29/07. Court Reporter: Dep't. 11. | 07-13801 | |
07/13/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Certificate of Acknowledgment (served 3/29/07 transcript.) | 07-15242 | |
09/17/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Regarding Transcripts. Appellant shall include a copy of the March 29, 2007, transcript in the appendix to the opening brief and Ms. Hawkins is not obligated to file a copy of the transcript in this court. | 07-20510 | |
09/25/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix. | 07-21123 | |
10/12/2007 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 07-22659 | |
10/12/2007 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 5. | 07-22662 | |
10/31/2007 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondent Milko. | 07-23886 | |
11/01/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Compliance. Respondent Milko's Answering Brief. | 07-23957 | |
11/13/2007 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondent Div. of Industrial Relations. | 07-24734 | |
11/16/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Respondent Division of Industrial Relations' Certificate of Service-Answering Brief. | 07-25081 | |
12/26/2007 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed. | ||
01/30/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Consolidating Appeals and Submitting Appeal (Docket No. 49422) for Decision Without Oral Agrument. We consolidate these appeals. Docket No. 49422 shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein. Nos. 47713/49422 (08-02318). | ||
01/30/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
05/29/2008 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded with instructions (Docket No. 47713; remanded with instructions (Docket No. 49422)." Before Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas. Author: Hardesty, James W.. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas. 124 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 35. (Copies have been distributed to all counsel, the district judge, and the district court clerk per this court's docket)SNP08/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas. Nos. 47713/49422 | 08-13430 | |
06/24/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-13750 | |
06/24/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/02/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 27, 2008. | 08-13750 |