judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CASTELLANOS VS. LA FUENTE, INC.

Case Information: 49386
Short Caption:CASTELLANOS VS. LA FUENTE, INC.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A501047Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:06/13/2007 / Haberfeld, StephenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/11/2008How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/04/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Legal Wings - check no. 46639.
05/04/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 07-09951
05/16/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. 07-10873
05/17/2007Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kathleen M. Paustian. 07-10928
05/22/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-11295
05/22/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. - Docketing Statement. 07-11296
06/05/2007Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Letter from Settlement Judge Paustian voluntarily recusing herself from this matter and requests it be assigned to another settlement judge. 07-12223
06/13/2007Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. 07-12902
07/09/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 07-14885
08/21/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 07-18442
09/12/2007Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 07-20128
09/14/2007MotionFiled Motion. Emergency Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment to Transfer Property, or, in the Alternative, Emergency Motion for Order Staying Enforcement pending Review of Supersedeas Bond Amount. (filed via fax) 07-20332
09/17/2007MotionFiled Motion. Emergency Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment to Transfer Property, or, in the Alternative, Emergency Motion for Order Staying Enforcement pending Review of Supersedeas Bond Amount. (ORIGINAL--filed via fax on 9/14/07) 07-20400
09/26/2007MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Emergency Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment to Transfer Property, or, in the Alternative, Emergency Motion for Order Staying Enforcement pending Review of Supersedeas Bond Amount. 07-21295
10/01/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/06/07. To Court Reporter: Free Lance Court Reporters. 07-21568
10/04/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 8/6/07. Court Reporter: Kim Tuchman. 07-21919
10/11/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Denying Stay and Motion to Waive or Modify Supersedeas Bond. Because the district court already has stayed its order, we deny as moot appellant's request that we do likewise. 07-22515
12/17/2007MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: January 10, 2008. 07-27270
01/24/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Second Motion. 08-01863
01/30/2008Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the opening brief and appendix received on January 22, 2008. Respondent: 30 days to file answering brief. 08-02319
01/30/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. 08-01641
01/30/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 08-01644
02/04/2008MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Appellants' Second Motion for Extension of Time to File and Serve Brief. 08-02746
02/07/2008Other Returned Mail. Order filed 1/30/08 addressed to Atty Jocelyne Uy remailed to corrected address. 08-03146
02/13/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. for reconsideration (response filed on 2/4/08). 08-03553
03/04/2008MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: March 31, 2008. 08-05351
03/20/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief. 08-06941
03/26/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Errata to Respondent's Answering Brief. 08-07469
04/25/2008MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: May 21, 2008. 08-10366
05/23/2008BriefFiled Reply Brief. 08-13052
07/11/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. 08-17694
07/11/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/04/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court's order confirming the arbitration award." EN BANC-MG/WM/JH/RP/MD/MC/NS 08-22714
09/30/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-23461
09/30/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/08/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 3, 2008. 08-23461