Case Information: 49385 | |||
Short Caption: | ISANI VS. ZARLING C/W 48282/48791 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 48282 *, 48791 , 49385 | Related Case(s): | 48282 , 48791 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A482362 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/04/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from David K. Rosequist - check no. 1436. | ||
05/04/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/No Settlement. Notice of exemption from settlement conference program mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 07-09930 | |
05/17/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 48282/48791/49385. | 07-10970 | |
05/21/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/28/06. To Court Reporter: Carlaya Lewis. | 07-11159 | |
05/21/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-11160 | |
05/25/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Respondents Metro Development, Inc., Metro Marketing & Sales, Inc. and Robert P. Bertges' Opposition to Appellants' Motion to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 48282/48791/49385. | 07-11617 | |
06/08/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 8/28/06. Court Reporter: Rachelle Hamilton. | 07-12578 | |
08/17/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Consolidation. We consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. We deny appellants' motion to the extent that it requests assignment of these appeals to the court's settlement conference program. Appellants shall have 30 days to file and serve a single opening brief and appendix for these consolidated appeals. Within 30 days of service of the opening brief, each respondent shall file an answering brief. fn1-[Any number of respondents may join in a single brief.] Within 30 days of service of the final answering brief, appellants may file a single reply brief, if deemed necessary. As a copy of the June 5, 2006, transcript has already been filed in these appeals, appellant need not include another copy of it in the appendix. Nos. 48282/48791/49385 | ||
09/18/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy of Transcripts. Nos. 48282/48791/49385. (07-20540) | ||
09/18/2007 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Nos. 48282/48791/49385. (07-20541) | ||
09/18/2007 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volumes 1 through 6. Nos. 48282/48791/49385. (07-20542) | ||
09/18/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Appellants' Supplemental Appendix. Nos. 48282/48794/49385. (07-20543) | ||
10/19/2007 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondents Land Title of Nevada and Debra Novotny. Nos. 48282/48791/49385 (07-23113). | ||
10/25/2007 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondents Dan Zarling and Zarling Realty, Inc.'s Answering Brief. Nos. 48282/48791/49385. (07-23558) | ||
10/29/2007 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondents Metro Dev., Metro Marketing, and Robert Bertges. Nos. 48282/48791/49385 (07-23717). | ||
11/28/2007 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Nos. 48282/48791/49385 (07-25584). | ||
12/27/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Counsel for appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Nos. 48282/48791/49385 (07-28135). | ||
01/24/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response. Nos. 48282/48791/49385 (08-01864). | ||
02/04/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Respondents Metro Development, Inc.; Metro Marketing & Sales, Inc.; and Robert P. Bertges' Reply to Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 48282/48791/49385 (08-02747). | ||
04/10/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER these appeals DISMISSED." NNP08-WM/MC/NS. Nos. 48282/48791/49385. | 08-08905 | |
04/24/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Verfied Bill of Costs. Nos. 48282/48791/49385. | ||
05/06/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Memorandum of Costs. Costs allowed and taxed: $103.60 | ||
05/06/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-09412 | |
05/06/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/16/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 13, 2008. | 08-09412 |