Case Information: 49401 | |||
Short Caption: | WILLIAMS (PETER) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR032519 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/08/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/08/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 07-10180 | |
05/16/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 07-10886 | |
05/16/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. - Joint Appendix. | 07-10887 | |
06/01/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 07-12052 | |
06/22/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Fast Track. On June 18, 2007, this court received a proper person motion from appellant requesting that this appeal be dismissed. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to supplement appellant's proper person motion to dismiss this appeal with an affidavit. | 07-13715 | |
07/10/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit. Affidavit of Bruce D. Voorhees in Support of Appellant's proper person Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 07-15021 | |
07/20/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP07-MG/MD/MC. fn1[Because no remittitur will issue in this matter, see NRAP 42(b), the one-year period for filing a post-conviction habeas corpus petition under NRS 34.726 (1) shall commence to run from the date of this order.] | 07-15844 | |
07/20/2007 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |