Case Information: 49399 | |||
Short Caption: | MONNETTE (ROBERT) VS. DISTRICT COURT | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C226637 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Certiorari/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/08/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/08/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. | 07-10175 | |
05/08/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Due Date: 10 days | 07-10206 | |
05/14/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Supplement to Petition for Writ. Petitioner's Record in Support of Writ of Mandamus/Prohibition. | 07-10679 | |
06/12/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. fn1[We direct the clerk to correct the caption in this matter to conform to the caption appearing in this order.] The Clark County Public Defender's Office shall have 10 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this petition should not be dismissed as moot. | 07-12804 | |
07/09/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Filed June 12, 2007. | 07-14910 | |
03/06/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-05644 | |
04/01/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 08-07633 | |
04/01/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |