judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GLENNEN VS. KEMPTHORNE

Case Information: 49390
Short Caption:GLENNEN VS. KEMPTHORNECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A492794Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/16/2007 / Aurbach, PhillipSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:02/11/2009 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:02/11/2009How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/04/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Robert E. Glennen, III - check no. 3449.
05/04/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 07-10007
05/16/2007Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Phillip Aurbach. 07-10830
05/18/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-11031
06/15/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference has been scheduled. 07-13166
08/20/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 07-18353
09/12/2007Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 07-20170
09/18/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Counsel for appellant shall have15 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. 07-20622
09/28/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Open Extension of Time for Ordering Transcripts. 07-21486
10/04/2007MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. 07-21899
10/10/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have 15 days from the entry of this court's order regarding jurisdiction to request transcripts in compliance with NRAP 9(a). 07-22412
11/20/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Allowing Appeal to Proceed and Setting Time to Comply with NRAP 9 and to File Briefs. We conclude that we have jurisdiction over this appeal. Request for Transcripts due 15 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due 70 days. 07-25336
12/06/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Open Extension of Time to File Transcript Request Forms. 07-26511
12/07/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/10/06 and 03/12/07; September 26, 27, 28, and 29, 2006; October 2 and 3, 2006. To Court Reporter: Thelma Stapley. 07-26579
12/07/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/29/05. To Court Reporter: Sharon Howard. 07-26580
12/07/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/13/06. To Court Reporter: Gina Shrader. 07-26581
12/12/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 08/29/05. Court Reporter: Sharoon Howard. 07-26986
12/18/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for an extension of time to file transcript request form. Fn 1[The transcript request forms were received and filed on December 7, 2007.] 07-27384
01/09/2008TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 04/10/06, September 26, 27, 28, and 29, 2006, October 2 and 3, 2006 and March 12, 2007. Court Reporter: Thelma Stapley. 08-00601
01/30/2008MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: February 28, 2008. 08-02381
02/15/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to file Transcripts. Court Reporter Shrader: Transcripts due 20 days. Fn1 [A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] 08-03848
02/27/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Opening Brief. 08-04829
03/05/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: 3/31/08. 08-05483
03/28/2008MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 50 pages. 08-07799
03/28/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. 08-07800
03/28/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 10. 08-07801
04/03/2008TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 03/13/06. Court Reporter: Gina Shrader. 08-08451
04/30/2008MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: May 30, 2008. 08-10730
05/30/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Second Request. 08-13684
06/06/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: 6/16/08. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-14311
06/18/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Third request. 08-15607
06/23/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Fourth request. 08-16033
06/25/2008BriefReceived Answering Brief. (FILED PER ORDER 07/07/08). 08-16190
07/07/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motions. The clerk shall file the answering brief received on June 25, 2008. Reply brief due: 30 days if deemed necessary. 08-17223
07/07/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief. 08-16190
08/07/2008BriefFiled Reply Brief. 08-20485
01/06/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on February 11, 2009 at 11:30 a.m. (SNP09-RP/MD/KP) 09-00192
01/28/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 09-02477
02/11/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/31/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP09-RP/MD/KP 09-18737
08/20/2009Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. 09-20322
08/20/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150 from Shook & Stone, Chtd. Check No. 20183
11/03/2009Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). 09-26791
12/01/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-28515
12/01/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/09/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 6, 2009. 09-28515