Case Information: 49382 | |||
Short Caption: | PALMES VS. STATE, DEP'T OF TRAINING AND REHABILITATION | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A529079 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/03/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
05/03/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 07-09916 | |
05/03/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 07-09917 | |
06/07/2007 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Letter in response to Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee issued on 5/3/07. | 07-12473 | |
06/15/2007 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. to Appoint Counsel. | 07-13180 | |
06/18/2007 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion to Appoint Counsel. | 07-13288 | |
07/10/2007 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion for an Extension of Time Pending the Motion to Appoint Counsel. | 07-15022 | |
08/22/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. for Appointment of Counsel and to Include Appeal in Settlement Program, Denying Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, Directing Compliance with NRAP 24(a), and Granting Extenstion of Time to File Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement and to Request Transcripts. Filing fee or proper motion to proceed in forma pauperis due: 15 days. Transcript request form due 15 days. Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement due: 30 days. | 07-18538 | |
09/07/2007 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Response. Response to 8/22/07 order (Order to Proced in Forma Pauperis filed in district court on May 23, 2007-submitted as a motion) | 07-19663 | |
10/09/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Appellant's Appeal for Failure to Prosecute. | 07-22240 | |
11/09/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. fn1[Because the district court has granted appellant in forma pauperis status, no filing fee is due.] | 07-24511 | |
12/04/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-26076 | |
12/04/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/19/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 6, 2007. | 07-26076 |