Case Information: 51314 | |||
Short Caption: | ADVANCED ARCHITECTURAL METALS, INC. VS. STATE CONTRACTORS BD. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A549030 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 05/05/2008 / Berkson, Lester | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/25/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
03/25/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-07276 | |
03/25/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 08-07278 | |
03/28/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Bill C. Hammer. | 08-07701 | |
03/31/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Appellant (Bridal Elegance & Tuxedos--check no. 1157). | ||
04/11/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-09077 | |
04/11/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. -docketing statement. | 08-09078 | |
04/24/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. | 08-10212 | |
04/25/2008 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. Settlement Judge Bill Hammer recuses himself from this case. | 08-10332 | |
05/05/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson | 08-11065 | |
05/20/2008 | Other | Returned Mail. Amended Notice of Assignment to NRAP 16 Settlement Program 5/5/08 to John C. Ohrenschall. No forwarding address. | 08-12705 | |
05/29/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for June 18, 2008. | 08-13480 | |
06/09/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. Appellants' counsel cannot be contacted. This case should be removed from the settlement program. | 08-14533 | |
09/26/2008 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. and Regarding Counsel. Appellants' Counsel: 15 days to respond to this order indicating whether appellants still wish to proceed with this appeal. This appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-24936 | |
10/07/2008 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 9/26/08 and mailed to John C Ohrenschall at the 5335 Wynn Rd address. Postal sticker states "Moved Left No Address", unable to forward. | 08-25866 | |
01/23/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "This appeal is dismissed as abandoned." This matter warrants the referral of this matter to the State Bar of Nevada, as cautioned in our September 26, 2008, order. Accordingly, we refer this matter to the State Bar of Nevada for investigation pursuant to SCR 105. Bar Counsel shall, within 90 days of the date of this order, inform this court of the status or results of the investigation and any disciplinary proceedings. Fn2 [The clerk shall provide bar counsel with a copy of this court's order entered on 9/26/08.] NNP09-MC/NS/MG. | 09-02070 | |
02/17/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-02088 | |
02/17/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/27/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 23, 2009. | 09-02088 | |
03/13/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 1/23/09 sent by certified mail to John C Ohrenschall at the PO Box address, Las Vegas. Per USPS, "Unclaimed, unable to forward". | 09-06538 | |
04/28/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Status Report. Investigative Report from State Bar of Nevada re attorney John Ohrenschall. NOTE: This original document was placed in attorney Ohrenschall's bar file. No copy was placed in the correspondence file for this case. | ||
05/27/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 1/23/09 addressed to John Ohrenschall. Per USPS, "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward". | 09-13219 | |
05/27/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Remittitur issued 2/17/09 addressed to John Ohrenschall. Per USPS, "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward". | 09-13220 | |
10/16/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Status Report from the State Bar of Nevada regarding attorney John Ohrenschall. |