Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/25/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Dempsey Roberts & Smith, Ltd.--check no. 022941. | | |
03/25/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | | 08-07271 |
03/26/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. | | 08-07523 |
04/11/2008 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. Respondents' counsel, Steven Jaffe, reports that Appellant's counsel will withdraw this appeal. Requests Court vacate NRAP 16 deadlines for settlement conference. | | 08-09069 |
04/11/2008 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. Appellant's counsel David Matheny states that Respondents' counsel erroneously reported that appeal was improperly filed and would be withdrawn. | | 08-09074 |
04/17/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | | 08-09649 |
05/06/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. | | 08-11260 |
05/09/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. Appellant's counsel reports that this appeal will be dismissed. The conference scheduled for 5/21/08 is therefore cancelled. | | 08-11616 |
05/28/2008 | Filing Fee | Returned Filing Fee. Check No. 023177 returned to Dempsey, Roberts & Smith, Ltd. (Filing fee previously paid.) | | |
05/28/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (Gina Perez) | | 08-13375 |
05/28/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Gina M. Perez--check no. 2322. | | |
05/28/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Frank Perez) | | 08-13378 |
05/30/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Confirm as Counsel. Due Date: 10 days | | 08-13705 |
06/04/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Withdraw Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. | | 08-14041 |
06/05/2008 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. Letter from Atty. David Matheny in response to Notice to Confirm as Counsel sent out on 5/30/08. | | 08-14273 |
08/22/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. of Record for Appellant Gina Perez. Emergency Review Requested. | | 08-21661 |
08/29/2008 | Filing Fee | Returned Filing Fee. Check No.023463 returned to Dempsey Roberts & Smith. | | |
08/29/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. | | 08-22400 |
09/19/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Response to the Court. | | 08-24355 |
09/19/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. -Response to the Court. Due date: 10 days. | | 08-24356 |
09/29/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Report to the Court. | | 08-25143 |
10/15/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We grant the motion to withdraw as counsel. The clerk shall remove the law firm of Dempsey Roberts & Smith, Ltd., from the docket of this appeal. Mr. Croteau: 15 days to file a notice of appearance with this court or to inform this court if he will not be representing appellants in this appeal. If Mr. Croteau will be representing appellants in this appeal, he shall file the docketing statement within 20 days from the date of this order. We grant Ms. Perez's Motion to Withdraw Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. Accordingly, no action will be taken in response to the Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. | | 08-26561 |
10/28/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Roger P. Croteau & Associates, Ltd.'s, Response to Order dated October 15, 2008. | | 08-27657 |
11/18/2008 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from attorney Joseph Garin, representing the law firm of Dempsey Roberts & Smith, Ltd., objecting to the 10/28/08 response filed by Roger Croteau & Associates. | | 08-29395 |
11/18/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. [Proposed] Motion to Strike Improper Parts in Response to Order Dated October 15, 2008. | | 08-29405 |
01/15/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Mr. Croteau fhas filed a response to our 10/15/08 order indicating that he does not represent any party in this appeal. On 11/18/08 attorney Joseph Garin filed a motion requesting this court to strike Mr. Croteau's response and indicating that his firm represents Dempsey Roberts. Both Mr. Croteau's response and Mr. Garin's motion contain information that is irrelevant to our decision on this matter. Accordingly we will disregard all irrelevant information in these documents. Fn1[We note that we granted Dempsey Roberts' motion to withdraw and there is no need for them to file any documents in this appeal.] Fn2[the irrelevant information in both documents primarily concerns the alleged malpractice claim against Dempsey Roberts.] We deny Mr. Garin's motion to strike Mr. Croteau's response. We remove this appeal from the settlement conference program and assign it to the court's pilot program for processing civil appeals. The clerk shall provide each appellant with a Civil Proper person Appeal Statement, a Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form and Instructions for Civil Litigants Without Attorneys. Appellants: Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement due in 40 days; Transcript Request Form due 15 days. Respondent is not required to file a response unless ordered to do so by this court. | | 09-01288 |
04/06/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP. | | 09-08540 |
05/05/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. -RECALLED PER ORDER 8/11/09.- | | 09-09556 |
05/05/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
05/13/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 8, 2009. -RECALLED PER ORDER 8/11/09.- | | 09-09556 |
06/04/2009 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from Frank and Gina Perez requesting "continuing this appeal." | | 09-14065 |
08/11/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Recalling Remittitur and Directing Answer to Rehearing Petition. Due: 15 days. | | 09-19516 |
08/28/2009 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Answer to Petition for Rehearing. | | 09-20984 |
09/08/2009 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Reply to Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Appellants' Response to Respondents' Answer to Petition for Rehearing. | | 09-21762 |
09/24/2009 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Granted. We grant the petition for rehearing and reinstate this appeal. Fn1 [In light of this circumstance, we waive the filing fee normally due for rehearing petitions.] | | 09-23316 |
11/05/2009 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Frank Perez. | | 09-27056 |
11/05/2009 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Gina Perez. | | 09-27058 |
02/05/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. | | 10-03311 |
02/25/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1-23. | | 10-05048 |
02/25/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
10/05/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Response. Due: 30 days. | | 10-25757 |
11/19/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time to File Response. | | 10-30387 |
11/23/2010 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter from Hall Jaffe & Clayton, LLP regarding the address for Frank and Gina Perez. | | 10-30585 |
12/06/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Respondent's Response due: December 17, 2010. | | 10-31720 |
12/20/2010 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Response to Appellants' In Proper Person Case Appeal Statements. | | 10-33079 |
01/13/2011 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Appellant's in Proper Person Response to Respondents Response on Attorney Fees and Costs. | | 11-01369 |
06/09/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part and Reversing in Part. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART." | | 11-17142 |
07/05/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 11-19720 |
07/05/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | | |
07/18/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 12, 2011. | | 11-19720 |