Case Information: 49384 | |||
Short Caption: | NELLIS MOTORS VS. STATE, DMV | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A509275 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Cherry | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 05/16/2007 / Buchanan, William | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | 10/16/2008 at 11:30 AM | Oral Argument Location: | Regional Justice Center |
Submission Date: | 10/16/2008 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/03/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Thorndal firm - check no. 022694. | ||
05/03/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 07-09927 | |
05/09/2007 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Maupin. Thorndal, Armstrong firm. | ||
05/09/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Justice Maupin - Thorndal, Armstrong firm. | 07-10254 | |
05/09/2007 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Cherry. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
05/16/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. | 07-10832 | |
05/22/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-11314 | |
05/22/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. - Docketing Statement. | 07-11315 | |
05/24/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | 07-11472 | |
05/30/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit. Docketing Statement mailed to Settlement Judge. | 07-11909 | |
06/14/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: June 29, 2007. | 07-13033 | |
07/02/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 07-14409 | |
07/09/2007 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 07-14929 | |
07/18/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 07-15702 | |
10/04/2007 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: November 9, 2007. | 07-21962 | |
11/09/2007 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 07-24562 | |
11/09/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 6. | 07-24563 | |
11/29/2007 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 9, 2008. | 07-25851 | |
12/18/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Joint Supplemental Appendix, Vol. 7. | 07-27428 | |
01/04/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-00313 | |
02/01/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Reply Brief due: 2/29/08. | 08-02677 | |
03/07/2008 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed. | ||
03/12/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 08-06197 | |
03/17/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the reply brief received on March 10, 2008. | 08-06505 | |
03/17/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-05952 | |
08/26/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on October 16, 2008 at 11:30 a.m. (SNP08-JH/RP/MD) | 08-21950 | |
10/02/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | 08-25439 | |
10/16/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP08-JH/RP/MD | ||
12/24/2008 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas. Author: Parraguirre, Ron. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas. 124 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 102. SNP08-Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas. | 08-32630 | |
01/20/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-01075 | |
01/20/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/30/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 23, 2009. | 09-01075 | |
02/05/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. to publishers re: corrections to recently filed opinions. | 09-03407 |