Case Information: 49383 | |||
Short Caption: | BIASHARA VS. BISHARA | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 49970 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A448203 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Cherry, Parraguirre | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Justice Maupin for Justice Cherry | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/03/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Anderson Legal Assoc. - check no. 1783. | ||
05/03/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/No Settlement. Notice of exemption from settlement conference program mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 07-09925 | |
05/03/2007 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Parraguirre. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
05/08/2007 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Cherry. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
05/08/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Justice Cherry sat in district court proceedings. | 07-10208 | |
05/21/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-11181 | |
05/24/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The time to request transcripts and the briefing schedule shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Respondents may file any reply within 10 days from the date that appellant's response is served. | 07-11485 | |
06/08/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. the clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the proper person documents received on May 24, 2007, and June 1, 2007. Appellant should address all concerns regarding this appeal to counsel, and shall proceed through counsel in the prosecution of this appeal. | 07-12535 | |
06/12/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 07-12794 | |
06/12/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Response to Docketing Statement. Joint Response of Respondents. Citibank (West) F.S.B. and Wells Fargo Bank National Association, to Appellant's Docketing Statement | 07-12828 | |
07/03/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP07-WM/MG/MD | 07-14566 | |
07/31/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-15586 | |
07/31/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/08/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 3, 2007. | 07-15586 |