Case Information: 51329 | |||
Short Caption: | BITZER (KENNY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR070278 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/26/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal for Kenny Allen Bitzer, Appellant | 08-07496 | |
03/26/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/26/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. This fast track appeal has been docketed as an electronic case. The Nevada Supreme Court Electronic Filing Pilot Program Rules and NRAP 3C govern this case. | 08-07497 | |
03/26/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Request for Rough Draft Transcript | 08-07499 | |
04/21/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. Fast Track Statement | 08-09841 | |
04/21/2008 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Joint Appendix | 08-09842 | |
05/13/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. of Telephonic Extension for Fast Track Response. Due Date: May 20, 2008. | 08-12026 | |
05/20/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. Fast Track Response | 08-12659 | |
09/10/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-23346 | |
10/07/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-23866 | |
10/07/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/22/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 8, 2008. (SCANNED BY CLERK) | 08-23866 |