judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ALLEN (NOEL) VS. WARDEN C/W 36924

Case Information: 36295
Short Caption:ALLEN (NOEL) VS. WARDEN C/W 36924Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 36294 *, 36295
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - HC0002003Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/06/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/16/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/16/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10268
09/27/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] nos. 36294/36295/36582.
03/06/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on: 3/2/01. 01-04037
03/06/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/14/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." fn6[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted. NNP02-MS/RR/NB. Nos. 36294/36295. 02-04625
04/09/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-04884
04/09/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/23/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 12, 2002. 02-04884