judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEVEN M. KRENNING and JOYCE C. KRENNING, husband and wife v. HEART MOUNTAIN IRRIGATION DISTRICT and JAMES FLOWERS and THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0271)
Case Number:S-07-0271Case Docketed On:11/27/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:STEVEN M. KRENNING and JOYCE C. KRENNING, husband and wife v. HEART MOUNTAIN IRRIGATION DISTRICT and JAMES FLOWERS and THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:STEVEN M. KRENNING and JOYCE C. KRENNING, husband and wife, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. HEART MOUNTAIN IRRIGATION DISTRICT and JAMES FLOWERS, Appellees (Defendants) and THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Intervenor).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSteven M. KrenningWilliam L. Simpson
Larry B. Jones
Michael S. Messenger
Thomas Wade Redmon
AppellantJoyce C. KrenningWilliam L. Simpson
Larry B. Jones
Michael S. Messenger
Thomas Wade Redmon
AppelleeHeart Mountain Irrigation DistrictJay A. Gilbertz
AppelleeJames FlowersJason A. Neville
Lori Lei Gorseth
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Elizabeth C. Gagen
Bridget L. Hill
Martin L. Hardsocg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Governmental Claims, Immunity
Opinion Number:2009 WY 11
Citation:200 P.3d 774

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/27/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/27/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/27/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/27/2007Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
11/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/04/2007Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
01/10/2008Brief - Appellants; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
01/10/2008Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
01/28/2008Motion - Intervene - State of WyomingMotionInterveneFinal
02/12/2008Order - Other granting motion to interveneOrderOtherFinal
02/21/2008Brief - Appellee Heart Mountain IrrigationBriefAppelleeFinal
02/26/2008Brief - Appellee James FlowersBriefAppelleeFinal
02/27/2008Brief - Other - received copy of brief of appellee Flowers on cdBriefOtherFinal
02/27/2008Service - Certificate of service (amended)ServiceCertificate of serviceFinal
02/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
03/10/2008Brief - Appellant reply to Heart Mountain Irrigation District and received copy of brief on diskBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/13/2008Brief - IntervenorBriefIntervenorFinal
03/21/2008Motion - Withdrawal of counsel Michael K. DavisMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
03/21/2008Order - Granting withdrawal of counselOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
05/16/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/20/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jason A. Neville for appellees Heart Mountain Irrigation District and James Flowers.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Elizabeth C. Gagen, Chief Deputy Attorney General for appellee State of Wyoming; Larry B. Jones for appellants; Jay A. Gilbertz for Hearth Mountain Irrigation District.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/27/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volumes I-IV, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/27/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/19/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Larry B. Jones for appellant; Jay A. Gilberts, Jason A. Neville and Elizabeth C. Gagen, Chief Deputy Attorney General for appellees) and takenunder advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/19/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/29/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/17/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/17/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/23/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 2/19/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal