Case Information: 49381 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO DANIELS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D366119 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/26/2008 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/03/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/03/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/No Settlement. Notice of exemption from settlement conference program mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 07-09911 | |
05/22/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/16/07. To Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub. | 07-11283 | |
05/22/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-11290 | |
06/20/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 03/16/07. Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub. | 07-13459 | |
07/30/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 07-16722 | |
07/30/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. (corrected) Due date: 10 days. | 07-16724 | |
08/03/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Errata of Page 3, Index of Exhibits-Proceedings: 3/16/07. Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub. | 07-17167 | |
08/06/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing/Motion for Extension of Time. | 07-17243 | |
08/13/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Application for Extension of Time and Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 07-17846 | |
08/21/2007 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response. Appellant's Reponse to State's Opposition to Application for Extension of Time and Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 07-18479 | |
10/11/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We grant appellant's extension motion and we deny the motion to dismiss this appeal. The clerk shall file the opening brief and appendix received on September 18, 2007. Respondent: 20 days to file the answering brief. | 07-22448 | |
10/11/2007 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 07-20566 | |
10/11/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. | 07-20567 | |
11/02/2007 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 07-24069 | |
11/02/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | 07-24070 | |
11/28/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion by Respondent K.D. for an Order Resetting Briefing Schedule and for Sanctions. | 07-25591 | |
12/04/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellant Marcella Jackson's Opposition to Minor Child K.D.'s Motion for an Order Resetting Briefing Schedule and for Sanctions. | 07-26162 | |
12/14/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. It is appropriate for Carl Daniels (Kevin) to paricipate in this appeal. The clerk shall modify the caption for this appeal to include Kevin as a respondent and modify this court's docket to identify attorneys Barbara E. Buckley and Steve Hiltz and Clark County Legal Services Program as cousel for appellant. Appellant's counsel serve: notice of appeal and docketing statement within 5 days. Appellant's counsel admonished. We conclude that no monetary or other sanction is appropriate. Fn1 [If appellant has not already served a copy of the appendix on Kevin, she shall do so within 5 days from the date of this order.] Fn2 [Appellant has waived the right to file a reply brief.] | 07-27215 | |
12/24/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing respondent Kevin Carl Daniels: Lewis & Roca (Daniel Polsenberg). | 07-27909 | |
12/24/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 07-27910 | |
12/26/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Receipt of Copy (docketing statement) | 07-27947 | |
01/07/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. Kevin: Answering Brief due 7 days. | 08-00431 | |
01/17/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Association of Counsel. Representing Respondent Daniels: Daniel F. Polsenberg and Jennifer B. Anderson of the law firm of Lewis and Roca LLP. | 08-01352 | |
01/17/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. (respondent Kevin Carl Daniels) | 08-01353 | |
02/26/2008 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed. | ||
03/26/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. | 08-07412 | |
03/26/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
05/08/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP08-WM/RP/MD | 08-11473 | |
06/03/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-11991 | |
06/03/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/11/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 5, 2008. | 08-11991 |