judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ZAMORA VS. PRICE

Case Information: 51321
Short Caption:ZAMORA VS. PRICECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 55452
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A479160Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/28/2008 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/22/2008How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/25/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
03/25/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 08-07332
03/25/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days 08-07336
03/28/2008Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. 08-07703
04/03/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be held on 4/21/08. 08-08395
04/15/2008Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Nevada General Insurance Co.- check no. 57278.
04/17/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. 08-09652
04/28/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 08-10539
04/28/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. -docketing statement. Due date: 10 days. 08-10550
04/29/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 08-10657
05/02/2008Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 08-10962
05/07/2008Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 08-11346
05/27/2008Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/08/08. To Court Reporter: Susan Naylor. 08-13273
05/27/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Due date: 10 days. 08-13274
06/04/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. . As respondent apparently has received the docketing statement, and in the interest of judicial efficiency, we waive appellant's obligation to file proof of service of the docketing statement in this instance only. 08-14129
06/10/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice this Appeal Involves a Constitutional Question. 08-14664
06/10/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Request for Transcripts. 08-14665
06/23/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Attorney General: Certification of Constitutional Issue. 08-15954
07/17/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Susan Naylor to file certificate of delivery of transcripts. Due date: 10 days. 08-18380
08/04/2008MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: 9/4/08. 08-20106
09/08/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. 08-23116
09/08/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 3. 08-23118
09/12/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional Sanction of $250.00 due: 15 days or court reporter Susan Naylor's certificate of delivery or motion due: 10 days. fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] 08-23690
09/22/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Susan Naylor stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/08/08. (Certificate of Reporter). 08-24488
10/02/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief. 08-25523
11/03/2008MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: November 24, 2008. 08-28017
11/26/2008BriefFiled Reply Brief. 08-30269
12/22/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. 08-32436
12/22/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/30/2008Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Nevada Certified Court Reporters Board regarding their investigation conducted against court reporter Susan L. Naylor. 08-32968
08/06/2009Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons. Author: Cherry, Michael A.. Majority: Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons. 125 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 32. NNP09-Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons. 09-19133
08/26/2009Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Appellant Steve Zamora's Petition for Rehearing. 09-20814
08/26/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150 from Nevada General Insurance Co. Check No. 65489.
09/24/2009Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). 09-23301
10/20/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-24054
10/20/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/29/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 23, 2009. 09-24054