Case Information: 51316 | |||
Short Caption: | ALLEN (CAMERON) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 32493 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/25/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/25/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 08-07303 | |
04/03/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. | 08-08420 | |
04/18/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We grant Mr. Morris's motion to withdraw. District Court Order due: 35 days. | 08-09706 | |
04/25/2008 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on April 24, 2008. Order Appointing Counsel - -Jacob N. Sommer, Esq., appointed as counsel for appellant. | 08-10347 | |
04/25/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Appointed Counsel. Docketing statement due: 15 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days. | 08-10348 | |
05/13/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-11947 | |
05/13/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/10/07. To Court Reporter: Cathy Terhune. | 08-11948 | |
05/15/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/10/07. To Court Reporter: Tanya Lemich. | 08-12315 | |
06/27/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Tonja Gill Lemich stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: October 10, 2007 through October 12, 2007. | 08-16509 | |
09/03/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix. | 08-22653 | |
09/05/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. | 08-22892 | |
09/24/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. Appellant consents to a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. Cause appearing, we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED" NNP08C-MC/WM/NS. | 08-24632 | |
09/24/2008 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |