Case Information: 51315 | |||
Short Caption: | RATLIFF (MICHAEL) VS. NEV. DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Pershing Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - PI070582 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/25/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/25/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-07297 | |
04/18/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-09744 | |
05/13/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-09790 | |
05/13/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/19/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This court denies the proper person motion requesting that three justices be appointed to resolve the matter on the merits. | 08-12463 | |
05/23/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 14, 2008. | 08-09790 | |
06/02/2008 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 5/19/08 to Michael Curtis Ratliff. Stamp on envelope "Paroled". No forwarding address. | 08-13800 |