Case Information: 49414 | |||
Short Caption: | SHEARSON FINANCIAL NETWORK VS. SANDPOST, LLC | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A531927 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 05/17/2007 / Roitman, Howard | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/09/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
05/09/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 07-10362 | |
05/09/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 07-10363 | |
05/09/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | 07-10364 | |
05/17/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Howard Roitman. | 07-10922 | |
05/31/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 07-11970 | |
05/31/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Notice of Withdraw of Appeal. | 07-11973 | |
06/06/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Appellant's Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. | 07-12392 | |
06/08/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. appellant shall submit the $250 filing fee to the clerk of this court within 10 days of the date of this order. We defer ruling on appellant's motion to dismiss this appeal, pending payment of the filing fee. | 07-12543 | |
06/15/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Goodman Brown & Premsririut-check no. 6561. | ||
07/05/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to the motion for a voluntary dismissal filed on May 31, 2007, "This appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). | 07-14630 | |
07/05/2007 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |